Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1172830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Edward De-Beger | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Lauryn Wrigley | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Pearson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darcie Jones | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Hocking MBCS | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isla Symons | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zachary Axel Harishbhai Rameshbhai Patel | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Christopher Simpson | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tonari Sophia Arikekpar | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniella Marley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Hemsley | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hopkinson | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.