Trustees Compassion Acts
Charity number: 1172948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dympna Edwards | Chair | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Francis Montgomery | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graham Colin Turner | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Latham Oliver | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Harrison | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Holdsworth | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marlyn Banham | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Vivian Cupit | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Allan Salisbury MBE | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev PATRICK EVANS | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.