Trustees Compassion Acts

Charity number: 1172948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Dympna Edwards Chair 17 December 2021
None on record
William Harrison Trustee 09 April 2021
None on record
Michael Perrett Trustee 06 November 2020
None on record
Marlyn Banham Trustee 05 June 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, SOUTHPORT
Received: On time
Alex Holdsworth Trustee 05 June 2020
None on record
Tracey Ann Illingsworth Trustee 24 February 2019
None on record
Vivian Cupit Trustee 30 October 2018
None on record
John Allan Salisbury MBE Trustee 02 February 2018
None on record
Rev PATRICK EVANS Trustee 02 November 2016
None on record