Trustees THE BIRMINGHAM ROYAL INSTITUTION FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 516477
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Roger Bullock | Chair | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jessop | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Paul Draisey | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Edgerton | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda McGeever | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Warwick Richards | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gascoigne | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hindle | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.