Trustees THE BIRMINGHAM ROYAL INSTITUTION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 516477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEOFFREY MICHAEL WHITTALL OAKLEY Chair
JOHN FEENEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE OAKLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Amanda McGeever Trustee 07 December 2021
QUEEN ALEXANDRA COLLEGE
Received: On time
Ian Warwick Richards Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
Christopher Gascoigne Trustee 04 March 2019
FOCUS BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
John Duncan Montgomery Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
Richard John Hindle Trustee 03 October 2016
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JAMES BRADSHAW Trustee 24 February 2015
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN QUANTRILL Trustee
None on record