Financial history THE BIRMINGHAM ROYAL INSTITUTION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 516477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £784.23k £919.81k £884.09k £915.17k £880.90k
Total expenditure £852.93k £934.85k £979.53k £906.83k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.17k £47.49k £5.08k £31.82k £2.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £732.25k £814.36k £818.01k £816.96k £816.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.81k £57.97k £61.00k £66.39k £62.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.24k £45.66k £386 £29.16k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £839.99k £920.18k £964.09k £890.71k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.94k £14.67k £15.44k £16.12k £16.11k
Expenditure - Governance £20.27k £115.05k £0 £7.50k £19.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £706.92k £805.13k £860.92k £614.36k £985.38k
Expenditure - Investment management £12.94k £14.67k £15.44k £16.12k £16.11k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £81.43k