THE INSTITUTE FOR LAW ACCOUNTABILITY AND PEACE

Charity number: 1000444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £2.18k £1.67k £1.06k £1.04k £698
Total expenditure £1.91k £399 £43 £588 £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A