THURMASTON (OLD SCHOOL) CHURCH AND COMMUNITY (DEVELOPMENTS) CHARITY

Charity number: 1001098
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required