THURMASTON (OLD SCHOOL) CHURCH AND COMMUNITY (DEVELOPMENTS) CHARITY

Charity number: 1001098
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £10.16k £9.53k £8.36k £8.39k £4.89k
Total expenditure £7.24k £6.03k £6.06k £6.08k £23.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A