Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF NAROLER KOLEL BETH SHMUEL AARON

Charity number: 1001222
Charity reporting is overdue by 876 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 510 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 876 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 876 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 02 September 2019 209 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 June 2018 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required