Financial history FRIENDS OF NAROLER KOLEL BETH SHMUEL AARON

Charity number: 1001222
Charity reporting is overdue by 922 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £24.96k £16.64k £23.84k £17.17k £24.09k
Total expenditure £24.36k £16.61k £24.24k £15.22k £24.26k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A