NIGHTSAFE LIMITED

Charity number: 1002057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Davies Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
Sylvia Edwards Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
Vivienne Davenport Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH TAYLOR Trustee 13 November 2017 None on record
Mubashar Ahmed Khaliq Trustee 07 October 2013 None on record
RICHARD MARSH Trustee 10 November 2021
BLACKBURN COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB Received: On time
JOHN ANTHONY STURGRESS Trustee 26 February 2014 None on record
Lucy Ross Trustee 20 December 2013 None on record
IAN EDWARD WALMSLEY Trustee 11 October 2017 None on record