Accounts and annual returns HINDU CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (WALES)

Charity number: 1002569
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window