CARDIGAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1003087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 July 2019 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 July 2019 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 January 2018 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 September 2017 77 days late Download