STOCKFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Elizabeth Ross Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
ELIZABETH ANN LEACH Trustee 19 March 2014 None on record
DAVID GEORGE STOKES Trustee 22 March 2016 None on record
Natalie Potter Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
JOHN ANTHONY O'SHEA Trustee 09 October 2018
TYSELEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Overdue by 500 days
Jasvinder Mahami Trustee 12 February 2018 None on record
Andrew William Baker Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record
AMANDA JAYNE MILLWARD Trustee None on record
MIKE RUSSELL Chair None on record
Velida Dautovic Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record