Trustees SHROPSHIRE BADGER GROUP

Charity number: 1003228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James William Ashley Chair 20 November 1991
CUAN WILDLIFE RESCUE
Received: On time
PHILIP IAN LOVEDAY Trustee 16 September 2021
DUDLEY AND WEST MIDLANDS ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Margaret Ann Megan-Jones Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Tris Pearce Trustee 24 September 2015
None on record
TRACEY LOUISE PRICE Trustee 25 August 2015
None on record
HARRIET BARTLETT Trustee 25 August 2015
None on record
SHARON DAVIES-CULHAM Trustee 25 July 2015
THE PLANTATION WOOD ELLESMERE
Received: On time
Michele Vaughan Trustee 26 March 2015
None on record
Rod Bennett Trustee 17 June 1999
None on record
Doug Hughes Trustee
CUAN WILDLIFE RESCUE
Received: On time