THE BRUNEL MUSEUM

Charity number: 1003287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £288.30k £416.94k £202.84k £238.19k £428.57k
Total expenditure £422.96k £265.47k £173.41k £248.30k £344.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.45k £0 £4.85k N/A £242.31k