THE BRUNEL MUSEUM

Charity number: 1003287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Jane Stockwell Ross Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record
Nicholas Anthony Mansell Trustee 02 May 2019 None on record
Maureen Nolan Trustee 05 February 2019 None on record
Richard Arthur Davies Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record
Francis Caroline Scott Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record
Peronel Rosemary Craddock Trustee 02 May 2019 None on record
Kathryn Adams Trustee 08 April 2020 None on record
Danielle Barbara Skelley OBE Chair 16 January 2020
THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION Received: On time
Michael Conrad Heap Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record
Cheryl Naomi Smith Trustee 20 October 2021 None on record
Tiffany Gabrielle Grimwade Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record