ASSUMPTION SCHOOL BURSARY FUND

Charity number: 1003493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 November 2019 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 17 July 2018 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 11 July 2017 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required