ASSUMPTION SCHOOL BURSARY FUND

Charity number: 1003493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £853 £1.21k £1.66k £1.06k £1.18k
Total expenditure £905 £1.56k £1.39k £1.04k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A