PICKHURST INFANT SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1003649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.94k £29.47k £10.37k £10.53k £8.88k
Total expenditure £12.83k £35.04k £8.40k £7.71k £10.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A