1ST LOSCOE ST LUKES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1004041
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 December 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required