1ST LOSCOE ST LUKES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1004041
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.60k £9.42k £7.56k £7.03k £10.27k
Total expenditure £19.63k £8.50k £7.44k £10.51k £12.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A