Financial history MENCAP LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1004262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £239.38k £248.37k £524.52k £268.30k £359.80k
Total expenditure £237.88k £260.12k £270.56k £272.87k £357.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.60k £36.00k £33.18k £53.38k £55.34k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £10.04k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £34.34k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £201.88k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.40k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £276.87k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £242.54k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £28.02k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.01k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £616 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A