Trustees MENCAP LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1004262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Smith Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Aikaterini Valvi Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Maria Cabrera Urda Trustee 11 April 2016
None on record
Phil Corfield Trustee 25 November 2014
None on record
Beth Greenhill Trustee 11 December 2013
None on record
Carolyn McConnell Trustee 11 October 2013
PASSION FOR LEARNING CIO
Received: On time
STEPHEN MAHON Trustee 23 September 2013
None on record