NEW DIRECTIONS (RUGBY) LIMITED

Charity number: 1005302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.37m £2.76m £3.44m £3.54m £3.93m
Total expenditure £2.24m £2.64m £3.30m £3.36m £3.84m
Income from government contracts £2.08m £2.74m £2.63m £2.81m £3.19m
Income from government grants £6.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £43.14k £14.17k £28.44k £31.22k £10.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.33m £2.74m £3.41m £3.51m £3.92m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £979 £587 £956 £1.50k £1.45k
Income - Other £376 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £19.68k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.21m £2.64m £3.30m £3.36m £3.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £35.42k £8.47k £5.10k £2.53k £7.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £35.42k £0 £0 £0 £0