TUNBURY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1005560
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 September 2021 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required