YORKSHIRE PROFICIENCY TEST COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1006706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 October 2019 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 October 2019 96 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2016 On time Download