Governing document ROCHDALE LAW CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 FEBRUARY 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 6 NOVEMBER 1991, 6 JANUARY 2005 , 7 DECEMBER 2005 AND 22 JANUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
1) TO ESTABLISH A LEGAL SERVICE FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING POVERTY PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF THE ROCHDALE BOROUGH COUNCIL. 2) TO WORK TOWARDS EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES IN THE PROVISION OF THAT LEGAL SERVICE AND TO WORK IN AN ANTI-DISCRIMINATORY MANNER IN THE SUPPORT OF PERSONS USING THAT SERVICE. 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING WITHIN THE AREA OF ROCHDALE BOROUGH COUNCIL. 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO COMMUNITY GROUPS PRIMARILY FOR THE PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING IN THE AREA OF ROCHDALE BOROUGH COUNCIL.
Area of benefit
PRIMARLIY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE AREA OF ROCHDALE BOROUGH COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.