Financial history THE WORLD OF GLASS (ST HELENS) LIMITED

Charity number: 1006990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £525.82k £464.18k £594.91k £682.53k £551.78k
Total expenditure £722.01k £725.32k £723.61k £616.04k £744.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £225.00k £177.23k N/A £89.03k £200.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £225.00k N/A £329.58k £618.11k £306.31k
Income - Other trading activities £251.43k N/A £231.78k £62.02k £221.29k
Income - Charitable activities £48.31k N/A £33.55k £2.38k £24.17k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £4 £22 £11
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £424.29k N/A £437.04k £407.45k £468.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £292.28k N/A £286.57k £208.59k £275.10k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £7.10k £7.10k £7.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.44k N/A £0 £0 £0