EAST SHROPSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 1007044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.00k £2.31k £3.06k £3.64k £2.30k
Total expenditure £1.51k £1.80k £2.19k £3.68k £2.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A