Financial history HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1008049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.13k £9.90k £7.63k £12.31k £11.45k
Total expenditure £9.03k £9.13k £9.45k £7.41k £10.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A