MARKET HARBOROUGH C OF E SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1009734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
sarah pears Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Julie Dale Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Sarah Leanne Conor Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Katie Campion Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
Andrew Reeves Chair 01 November 2020 None on record
Sarah Bodycote Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Nicola Marchesi Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Rebecca Lantsberry Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Charlotte Ball Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record