KINGS PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1010273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/08/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018 30/08/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £6.25k £6.46k £12.25k £5.33k £6.21k
Total expenditure £3.70k £2.74k £12.65k £12.26k £7.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A