Beacon Hill Academy Association

Charity number: 1010508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/10/2017 10/10/2018 10/10/2019 10/10/2020 10/10/2021
Total gross income £2.49k £1.40k £1.21k £448 £445
Total expenditure £1.44k £1.43k £1.63k £313 £361
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A