Trustees MICKLETON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1011422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ian Hutchinson | Chair | 13 May 1992 |
|
|||||
Amanda Thomas | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lezley Aldrich | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry Wilson | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Froom | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Gillings | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brown | Trustee | 07 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BAILEY | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|||||
ANGELA GILLINGS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE LAVINIA ROUTLEDGE | Trustee | 06 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEVE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.