MICKLETON VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1011422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required