Financial history ALTRINCHAM AND DISTRICT ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1012350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.49k £412 £465 £378 £0
Total expenditure £1.09k £407 £455 £663 £68
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A