THE BAT CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1012361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.31m £1.58m £1.53m £1.23m £1.27m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.34m £1.53m £1.51m £1.60m
Income from government contracts £427.78k £323.11k £437.69k £399.39k £361.10k
Income from government grants £121.28k £233.32k £120.84k £189.30k £116.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £248.69k £373.64k £259.94k £225.85k £279.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.16m £1.21m £937.24k £928.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £50.63k £51.42k £59.83k £65.42k £59.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £33.56k £125.00k £20.34k £7.61k £7.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.17m £1.36m £1.34m £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £161.28k £165.55k £168.87k £165.94k £192.38k
Expenditure - Governance £22.14k £19.31k £13.93k £15.20k £16.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £101.93k £13.70k £3.71k
Expenditure - Investment management £14.40k £15.63k £16.67k £16.73k £15.62k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0