HACKNEY YOUTH ORCHESTRAS TRUST

Charity number: 1013051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £74.14k £72.87k £83.93k £83.87k £65.26k
Total expenditure £74.04k £73.80k £75.30k £86.75k £93.01k
Income from government contracts £5.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.99k £5.00k £3.37k £5.00k