ST JOHN'S CHURCH BELLS RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 1013586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 March 2021 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required