ST JOHN'S CHURCH BELLS RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE FUND

Charity number: 1013586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £401 £1.34k £157 £390 £93
Total expenditure £0 £841 £816 £160 £70
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A