Financial history HOPE NOT HATE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1013880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £991.08k £914.09k £932.70k £1.15m £1.16m
Total expenditure £951.31k £984.65k £946.98k £1.10m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £85.40k £55.98k
Income - Donations and legacies £990.24k £914.09k £932.70k £1.01m £1.06m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £107.54k £10.14k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £833 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £34.85k £89.86k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £951.31k £979.15k £932.87k £1.08m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £14.12k £17.28k £1.82k
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £5.50k £4.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0