Financial history WEST BARNES SINGERS

Charity number: 1014531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/07/2018 08/07/2019 08/07/2020 08/07/2021 08/07/2022
Total gross income £25.28k £18.20k £9.41k £5.26k £8.42k
Total expenditure £20.48k £18.18k £7.56k £3.42k £12.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A