Financial history E C GRAHAM BELFORD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1014869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £80.19k £87.46k £110.21k £95.56k £94.95k
Total expenditure £212.26k £201.45k £193.66k £248.35k £213.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A