Accounts and annual returns E C GRAHAM BELFORD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1014869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window