CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH WORLD SOUL WINNING AND EVANGELISTIC MINISTRY

Charity number: 1014992
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £36.80k £30.08k £22.13k £14.49k £11.48k
Total expenditure £30.57k £23.73k £19.93k £21.59k £6.92k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A