Financial history DOWNE HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1015059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £20.51m £20.85m £21.86m £19.56m £21.19m
Total expenditure £19.05m £19.49m £20.64m £20.31m £20.67m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £453.00k £356.00k £332.00k £134.00k £110.00k
Income - Other trading activities £243.00k £238.00k £282.00k £37.00k £40.00k
Income - Charitable activities £19.74m £20.19m £21.16m £19.33m £20.83m
Income - Endowments £2.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.00k £37.00k £48.00k £37.00k £14.00k
Income - Other £51.00k £50.00k £41.00k £42.00k £1.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.58m £19.11m £20.24m £20.03m £20.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £381.00k £267.00k £276.00k £256.00k £211.00k
Expenditure - Governance £48.00k £42.00k £47.00k £46.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.00k £10.00k £10.00k £11.00k £12.00k
Expenditure - Other £104.00k £112.00k £121.00k £23.00k £14.00k