Friends of Hampton High

Charity number: 1015209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 September 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 June 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required