Friends of Hampton High

Charity number: 1015209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £3.33k £6.67k £8.44k £4.43k £2.30k
Total expenditure £1.47k £9.20k £2.08k £7.16k £2.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A